Accounts and annual returns ALBERT'S HORSE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1114287
Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 31 December 2024 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2024 306 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 August 2023 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 09 August 2023 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 June 2022 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 20 June 2022 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 March 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 17 March 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window