Financial history LEWISHAM EDUCATION ARTS NETWORK (LEAN)

Charity number: 1119396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.83k £129.88k £139.13k £64.41k £133.34k
Total expenditure £104.41k £104.05k £86.29k £102.00k £175.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.88k £81.30k £124.41k £60.00k £60.00k