LEWISHAM EDUCATION ARTS NETWORK (LEAN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEAN is a network organisation that helps build new relationships between the arts and education in the London Borough of Lewisham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 24 May 2007: Standard registration
- LEAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA JOBBINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sheree-Marie Abraham | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Emmanuel | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Austin-Burdett | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Croall | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Page | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Sarmiento | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Mirkin | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Henry | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Conyard | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dearbhaile Siun Nairn | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Elizabeth Semple | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Webster | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.83k | £129.88k | £139.13k | £64.41k | £133.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.41k | £104.05k | £86.29k | £102.00k | £175.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.88k | £81.30k | £124.41k | £60.00k | £60.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AMENDED 5 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING, WITHOUT ANY LIMITATION, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC AND VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
LEWISHAM LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ALBANY
ALBANY CENTRE & THEATRE
DOUGLAS WAY
LONDON
SE8 4AG
- Phone:
- 02086946622
- Email:
- SHARON@LEANARTS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window