Trustees DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)

Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Giles Sholto David Hedgecock Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Rebekka Welch Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Paul James Turle Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Edward Bassett Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Victoria Ellen Cannings Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Adrian Nicholas Goodhand Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Caroline Guinevere Sutton Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Paul Leslie Shelton Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record