AGORA THE FORUM FOR CULTURE AND EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to advance the education of the public regarding the purposes and values of Higher Education and the connections between culture and education, in particular but not exclusively by providing opportunities for public debate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 September 2006: Standard registration
- 30 April 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AGORA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.89k | £46.50k | £17.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.13k | £58.34k | £9.51k | £12.39k | £12.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 15 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 26 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE PURPOSES AND VALUES OF HIGHER EDUCATION AND THE CONNECTIONS BETWEEN CULTURE AND EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUR NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PUBLIC DEBATE AND DISCUSSION AND BY PUBLISHING PAMPHLETS AND BOOKS IN ORDER TO INCREASE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window