THE OPEN COLLEGE NETWORK SOUTH EAST REGION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- to promote and widen participation in education and training, particularly by those adults who have previously been excluded from educational opportunities - to improve the quality and flexibility of educational provision for the public benefit, primarily for those people who have previously been excluded from educational opportunities - to improve access to learning opportunities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£2,008,342
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.99m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,881,981
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.88m | |
Retained for future use | £126.36k |
People

31 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- India
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 01 June 2006: Standard registration
- OCNSER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Morag Morey | Chair | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomason | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Lennon | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Conway | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Baxter | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Jean Stilwell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Kent | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Playfair | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48m | £1.80m | £1.90m | £1.95m | £2.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41m | £1.55m | £1.70m | £1.90m | £1.88m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.47m | £1.79m | £1.90m | £1.95m | £1.99m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £230 | £349 | £421 | £14.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £10.53k | £0 | £314 | £395 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.41m | £1.55m | £1.70m | £1.90m | £1.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.52k | £20.81k | £0 | £41.43k | £62.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £1.36k | £421 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.07k | £22.64k | £25.72k | £22.92k | £21.32k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.03m | £1.29m | £1.49m | £1.53m | £1.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £47.58k | £58.24k | £57.48k | £55.11k | £52.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2005 as amended on 02 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are the advancement of the education of the public in one or more of the following ways: (a) by promoting lifelong learning, increasing social inclusion through educational advancement and widening participation in education and training, particularly by those persons who have previously been excluded from or had limited access to educational opportunities; (b) by improving the quality and flexibility of education provision for the public benefit; (c) by improving access to learning opportunities and facilitating progression to further learning, employment and higher education particularly through the award of credits and credit-based qualifications; (d) by operating as an awarding organisation with the approval of any relevant regulatory authority, including but not necessarily restricted to • operating as an Access Validating Agency for the Quality Assurance Agency for Higher Education or the appropriate agency acting on behalf of the Department for Education or its successor; • operating as an Ofqual-approved awarding organisation and complying with the regulatory requirements for the development, delivery and assessment of national qualifications; • operating as a Scottish Qualifications Authority -approved awarding organisation and complying with the regulatory requirements for the development, delivery and assessment of national qualifications; • operating as an awarding organisation approved by the Security Industry Authority to provide qualifications for the security sector; as and when required, to further the Objects of the Charity. (e) by operating with full commitment to the distinctive mission of Access to Higher Education by widening participation and recognising the achievements of young people and adults through high quality, responsive and flexible accreditation; (f) by encouraging and assisting organisations to provide a wide range of accredited and quality assured learning opportunities; (g) by operating as a proactive, innovative and responsive organisation with respect to curriculum development; (h) by supporting public policy agendas for raising educational standards, improving levels of achievement, widening participation and promoting new opportunities for community involvement; (i) by providing a personalised quality assured service to users that is cost efficient and takes account of competition from other awarding organisations; (j) by providing a network with expertise in, and intelligence of, the external environment within which the Charity operates in order to provide staff development, information, guidance and networking to stakeholder organisations in all sectors; and (k) by operating a high quality, efficient organisation with a commitment to continuous improvement offering all aspects of the service within a quality assured and transparent framework.
Area of benefit
THE SOUTH EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Laser Learning Awards Open College Network SER Ltd
Cobb House
2-4 Oyster Lane
Byfleet
Surrey
KT14 7DU
- Phone:
- 01932569894
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window