Financial history CLIFF VILLAGES (LINCOLN)

Charity Number: 1114452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.13k £108 £2.02k £2.60k £3.20k
Total expenditure £1.77k £1.83k £3.38k £2.60k £2.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A