OASIS GLOBAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE FOLLOWING CAUSES; EDUCATIONAL HOUSING HEALTH RELIEF OF HARDSHIP DUE TO NATURAL DISASTERS AROUND GLOBE PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN ORGANIZATIONS AND CHURCHES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Romania
Governance
- 08 June 2006: Standard registration
- OASIS (Working name)
- OGT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR S GEORGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr RIYA ELIZABETH GEORGE | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN CHARLIE MAVELI | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £9.80k | £16.96k | £22.74k | £24.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.41k | £16.17k | £13.78k | £19.40k | £17.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS IN THIRD WORLD/DEVELOPING COUNTRIES FOR UNDERGRADUATE AND POST GRADUATE EDUCATION INCLUDING MEDICINE, NURSING, ENGINEERING AND COMPUTER STUDIES; (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN INDIAN STATES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; (C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN INDIA AND AFRICA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; (D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES, THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN INDIA EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES; (E) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY OR DISABLED RESIDENT IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISIONS OF CARERS AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO SUCH CARERS; (F) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE CARING FOR OR NURSING A PERSON WITH A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY IN ANY PLACE AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE CHRONICALLY SICK OR DISABLED BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE; (G) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES INCLUDING FINANCIAL HELP TO CHARITABLE HOSPITALS AND OTHER HEALTH INSTITUTIONS; (H) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION; (I) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIAN STATES BY PROVIDING A LOCAL SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS; (J) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID); (K) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS; (L) TO OFFER FINANCIAL AID TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN CHILDREN'S ORPHANAGES AND HOMES FOR THE ELDERLY IN ANY INDIAN STATES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAIR
ROWAN HOUSE
ROWHILL ROAD
DARTFORD
DA2 7QQ
- Phone:
- 01322666511
- Email:
- simongeorge45@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window