GOOD NEWS CHURCH WHALEY BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please see our website goodnewschurch.co.uk for details of all our current activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert David Cross | Chair | 17 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
Philip David Goulding | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Stephen Day | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
CHERYL JOY CHALMERS CROSS | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.01k | £23.83k | £22.10k | £54.90k | £75.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.23k | £16.49k | £24.73k | £28.65k | £107.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.75k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 NOV 2008 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
I THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AND STATEMENT OF PURPOSE OF GOOD NEWS CHURCH (THE STATEMENT, AS ATTACHED). II HE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN A CHRISTIAN CONTEXT. III THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN OF ALL AGES BY PROVIDING FOR THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS IN A CHRISTIAN CONTEXT. IV SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH. V THE FURTHERANCE OF OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE WORLDWIDE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY. VI THE FURTHERANCE OF CHRISTIAN UNITY LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY PROVIDED THAT SUCH UNITY IS CONSISTENT WITH THE STATEMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gospel Hall
Old Road
Whaley Bridge
HIGH PEAK
Derbyshire
SK23 7LA
- Phone:
- 01663750435
- Email:
- info@goodnewschurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window