BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY VENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birmingham Community Venture is committed to re-engaging young people by providing informal educational opportunities and activities. Thereby enabling them to realise there own potential and develop into confident and responsible citizens who will make a positive contribution to the social and economic wellbeing of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £220,000 from 6 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sazid Mahmud | Chair | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nazma Saddique | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARKET HUSSAIN | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aftaab Hussain | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £24.30k | £272.50k | £314.00k | £225.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £22.26k | £222.00k | £478.45k | £298.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £24.30k | £220.00k | £304.00k | £220.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2024 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING THROUGH: ALTERNATIVE PROVISION FOR EXCLUDED PUPILS AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION ACTIVITY BASED LEARNING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION SERVICES AND COURSES
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOCKLEY PORT MOORINGS
ALL SAINTS STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B18 7RL
- Phone:
- 077 62496128
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window