BRAINSTRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's principal charitable objects are to provide funding for the support of and treatment for people diagnosed with primary brain cancer, particularly critically sited brain tumours. The Trust also funds translational scientific research into the treatment of brain cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£652,450
Donations and legacies | £335.02k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £316.13k | |
Investments | £1.30k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£730,525
Raising funds | £82.75k | |
Charitable activities | £633.49k | |
Other | £14.29k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £97.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £633.49k |
People

15 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER BAKER | Chair | 09 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jack Lewis Jarvis | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Puneet Plaha | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Warrington | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|||||
KEVIN HIGGS | Trustee | 27 July 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £606.76k | £741.09k | £952.20k | £691.71k | £652.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £623.59k | £511.27k | £663.43k | £791.84k | £730.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £67.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £341.59k | £509.00k | £337.85k | £409.64k | £335.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £265.01k | £164.95k | £433.90k | £281.00k | £316.13k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £174.34k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £154 | £40 | £26 | £1.06k | £1.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £67.10k | £6.08k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £8.96k | £10.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £557.65k | £472.56k | £558.28k | £714.19k | £633.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £65.95k | £38.71k | £90.18k | £62.70k | £82.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.33k | £13.04k | £14.96k | £14.95k | £16.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £14.96k | £14.95k | £14.29k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.06k | £2.03k | £2.82k | £1.96k | £1.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £201.69k | £490.57k | £770.35k | £665.42k | £570.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £20.09k | £77.13k | £68.93k | £63.27k | £45.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 5 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUFFERING FROM PRIMARY OR SECONDARY BRAIN TUMOURS; (II) TO INCLUDE ASSISTANCE IN THE TREATMENT AN CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SUCH CONDITION AND IN FACILITATING TRAVEL TO PLACES OF TREATMENT OR CARE; (III) THE PROMOTION AND UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH SCIENTIFIC WORK, SCIENTIFIC INVESTIGATION AND DEVELOPMENT INTO ANY ASPECT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY INCLUDING ALL AREAS RELATING TO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, EFFECT, TREATMENT, RELIEF FROM SYMPTOMS, CARE AND PREVENTION OF PRIMARY OR SECONDARY BRAIN TUMOURS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH WORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; (IV) THE OBJECTS SHALL NOT BE LIMITED TO APPLICATION WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BUT SHALL APPLY TO TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE SAID CONDITION WORLDWIDE; (V) THE OBJECTS SHALL INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES TREATMENT AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Yvery Court
Castle Road
Cowes
Isle of Wight
PO31 7QG
- Phone:
- 01983292405
- Email:
- hq@brainstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window