ARTISTIC MINISTRIES SUNSET7

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Artistic Ministries through the project "Kids Against Crime" delivers structured out of school programmes to educate young people through leisure time activities so as to develop their physical and mental capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and their conditions of life may improve. It has been inactive since 2010, but hopefuly should be relaunched.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 20 October 2006: Standard registration
- ARTISTIC MINISTRIES (Working name)
- SS7 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANITA ELIZABETH SHERVINGTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Raeah Talitha Abilene Hewitt | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Phinehas Joel Stewart | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 2002, 6 DECEMBER 2004 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO HELP TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE. B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF: LADYWOOD, WINSON GREEN, EDGBASTON, LEEBANK/WOODVIEW AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: 1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE. 2) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS. C) OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN A WAY RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE THROUGH WELFARE PROJECTS SUCH AS DRUG PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
LADYWOOD, WINSON GREEN, EDGBASTON, LEEBANK/WOODVIEW AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 3
1 MELTON DRIVE
BIRMINGHAM
B15 2NB
- Phone:
- 07900986663
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window