KATE'S TRUST

Charity number: 1114497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General fundraising activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £25
Total expenditure: £5,056

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Hackett Trustee
CHARITY OF STEPHENSON CLARKE
Received: On time
ROBERT OPIE COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON RICHARD MARK HACKETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £175 £175 £25 £25 £25
Total expenditure £216 £216 £0 £0 £5.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 December 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 December 2024 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2022 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oak House
Cinder Hill Lane
Horsted Keynes
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH17 7BD
Phone:
07775881484