B'NAI MACCABIM SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Synagogue provides normal public worship services, spiritual support, education and pastoral support to members. Ministry arm provides educational, and spiritual support to Messianic Synagogues and individuals in various countries, in addition to financial and humanitarian support for orphanages in Zambia and Kenya. Bi-Annual day conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
- Israel
- Kenya
- Scotland
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 April 2007: Standard registration
- BMMS/Y (Working name)
- B'NAI MACCABIM MESSIANIC SYNAGOGUE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Douglas Chambers | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth McKenzie Chalmers | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chaya Robertson | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/03/2020 | 14/03/2021 | 14/03/2022 | 14/03/2023 | 14/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.28k | £43.92k | £44.20k | £45.16k | £57.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.13k | £44.02k | £44.24k | £44.62k | £53.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 March 2023 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2023 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 March 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
14 March 2020
(These accounts |
29 September 2021 | 258 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE SYNAGOGUE ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH FAITH THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF YESHUA THE MESSIAH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AN SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Constellation Mobile Home Park
Elsworth
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 4JP
- Phone:
- 01954 268060
- Email:
- rabbiruth2020@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window