AL-HAYAT CULTURAL & WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NO
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 03 August 2007: Standard registration
- AL-HAYAT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUBEEN AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIKANDAR MINHAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AFM MATIUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAVED M SHARIF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE RESIDENT IN EALING PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE AGED BETWEEN 8-19 YEARS (UP TO 25 IF THEY HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS) WHO ARE RESIDENT IN EALING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; (C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (D) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDENT PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN EALING; AND (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN EALING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SUBJECTS OF SUBSTANCE AND ALCOHOL MISUSE.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
211 SCOTTS ROAD
SOUTHALL
UB2 5DQ
- Phone:
- 07985247126
- Email:
- al-hayat@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window