JACOBS HOSPICE HOMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide shelter, care and help for destitute sick and frail elderly people in whatever way necessary. Care Home in Tamil Nadu provides end of life care with peace and dignity. Active Outreach project which takes food and assistance to homeless destitutes. Also provides food and assistance to patients in need at Government Hospital, Coimbatore, and to leprosy colonies in the Coimbatore area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 16 June 2006: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.18k | £34.94k | £26.37k | £28.00k | £15.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £30.38k | £29.40k | £29.62k | £15.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 18 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 07 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | 07 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE 'FAMILIES FOR CHILDREN' HOMES IN INDIA AND BANGLADESH BY RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND BANGLADESH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window