Financial history THE AUDREY EMMA LAMB CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS AND BIRDS

Charity number: 1114747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £55.98k £50.85k £58.80k £51.37k £54.56k
Total expenditure £37.76k £6.77k £61.12k £69.00k £66.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A