SHAMS DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shams Development Organisation was established with a vision to 'brighten the world' through education. Removing poverty by helping young and adults to gain skilled working knowledge. The organisation can and will in future operate worldwide. At present, we are busy in offering our services in General Education, skilled working experience, free medical camps in developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2006: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- AL-SHAMS FOUNDATION LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £756 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 23 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JULY 2006 AND BY UNDATED SPECIAL RESOLUTION.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND DEVELOPMENT TRAINING PROGRAMMES. (II) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL SKILLS, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS TO DESERVING PUPILS (C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (III) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF DESERVING PEOPLE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN SOCIALLY DEPRIVED AREAS EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Area of benefit
IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window