Financial history POLSTEAD PRESCHOOL OXFORD

Charity number: 1114438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £82.08k £104.53k £115.23k £135.24k £81.72k
Total expenditure £66.07k £74.19k £87.28k £106.90k £101.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.19k £50.26k £62.38k £70.92k £44.67k