MARESA VON STOCKERT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maresa von Stockert creates new performance, film, installation and choreography for visual arts and performance venues regionally, nationally and internationally, as well as delivering education workshops to all sectors of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2006: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 December 2011: Re-registered
- 25 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- Maresa von Stockert Limited (Working name)
- TILTED PRODUCTIONS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.48k | £270.58k | £17.36k | £484 | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.36k | £305.14k | £42.62k | £43.05k | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £189.00k | £190.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 February 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 SEP 2020 as amended on 23 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
3. The Company?s objects (the Objects) are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts including, without limitation the arts of dance, film, installation, dance-theatre, drama, mime, literature, singing and music by:- 3.1 providing opportunities for the general public to experience high quality arts activities, including film, visual arts installations and exhibitions, theatres and festival performances regionally, nationally and internationally 3.2 creating new performances, films, installations and choreography and present this at visual arts and performance venues and sites regionally, nationally and internationally.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window