Accounts and annual returns COUNTRY HILL ANIMAL SHELTER

Charity number: 1114853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 May 2022 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 May 2022 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window