Financial history COUNTRY HILL ANIMAL SHELTER

Charity number: 1114853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £176.02k £198.86k £274.58k £330.40k £396.10k
Total expenditure £174.81k £165.45k £275.30k £357.00k £396.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £102.41k £30.47k N/A N/A