YAA ASANTEWA NANNY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The preservation and conservation of 106 Heahtifled Road. Handsworth Birmingham for use as a centre to educate the public in the inventor James Watt. (2) To build a centre for education of the African Community. (3) To provide education and training for young people from the black minortiy ethnic communities and other socially or economically disadvantaed groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 October 2006: Standard registration
- YAN PROJECT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR TUCKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARNOLD WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALICIA SPENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NKRUMAH PEPUKAYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DELORES PINKNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
1 THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF 106 HEATHFIELD ROAD, HANDSWORTH, BIRMINGHAM FOR USE AS A CENTRE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN HE INVENTOR JAMES WATT. 2 TO BUILD A CENTRE FOR EDUCATION OF THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY. 3 TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE BLACK MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES AND OTHER SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS WITH A VIEW TO RAISING THEIR CAPACITY AND CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY BE BETTER ABLE TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS IN SOCIETY. 4 TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
HANDSWORTH, BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 HEATHFIELD ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B19 1HJ
- Phone:
- 01215542747
- Email:
- acsho@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window