AMERSHAM DERMATOLOGY AND CANCER RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and furthering for the public benefit research and education in the science of dermatology and cancer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 2006: Standard registration
- 29 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1171200 THE WILKINSON DERMATOLOGY TRUST
- AMERDERM RESEARCH TRUST (Working name)
- THE ERASMUS WILSON DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.81k | £2.05k | £1.11k | £276 | £321 | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.84k | £86.95k | £119.82k | £123.04k | £124.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 07 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 17 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 28 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND THE FURTHERING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF DERMATOLOGY AND CANCER, AND SCIENCES OR SUBJECTS CONNECTED WITH DERMATOLOGY AND CANCER AND WITH THE INTENT IN PARTICULAR (THOUGH AS NOT TO LIMIT THE CARRYING OUT OF THE SPECIFIED OBJECT TO ANY LOCALITY) TO CARRY OUT THE SPECIFIED OBJECT IN OR IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF AYLESBURY, AMERSHAM AND HIGH WYCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAM.
Area of benefit
AYLESBURY, AMERSHAM, HIGH WYCOMBE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window