THE WORD HOUSE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance of Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 June 2006: Standard registration
- ROCKChurch Kent (Working name)
- THE WORD HOUSE CHRISTIAN MINISTIRES (Previous name)
- WORD HOUSE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatrice Oluwatayo | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEREEN EKPEDE EDEMA | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLUWASEYI ISHOLA FAMILUSI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.67k | £120.84k | £134.98k | £143.58k | £150.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.38k | £138.03k | £161.76k | £133.60k | £146.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN MEDWAY, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF MEDWAY, KENT, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN MEDWAY, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MEDWAY, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
336-338 HIGH STREET
ROCHESTER
KENT
ME1 1BT
- Phone:
- 01634829765
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window