THE JOHN CLARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the life and works of John Clare. To advance the education of the public in all aspects of the arts. To advance the education of the public in the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment. To facilitate public access to John Clare's birth place and other land and properties related to his life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
- JCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY JOHN SHEERMAN MP | Chair |
|
||||||
Sir John Henry HAYES | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon Neil Phillips | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL CHIRICO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.28k | £33.46k | £21.82k | £7.39k | £19.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.66k | £62.61k | £65.81k | £78.60k | £80.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND WORKS OF JOHN CLARE, POET AND ENVIRONMENTALIST B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY POETRY AND MUSIC C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT D) TO FACILITATE PUBLIC ACCESS TO JOHN CLARE'S BIRTHPLACE AND OTHER LAND AND PROPERTIES RELATED TO HIS LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN CLARE COTTAGE
WOODGATE
HELPSTON
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 7ED
- Phone:
- 01733253330
- Email:
- info@clarecottage.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window