THE SLEEPING GIANT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Events:- Santa Parade; Revival of Mari Lwyd tradition; Community Coach Excursions 2. Media:- Completion of projects involving editing, filming and DVD production. 3. Heritage:-Recording the memories of local residents; Archiving local heritage material; Revival of the traditional art of storytelling; Exhibitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Powys
Governance
- 21 August 2006: Standard registration
- 21 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SGF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.35k | £17.07k | £14.80k | £16.25k | £7.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.67k | £18.84k | £20.66k | £17.70k | £9.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 13 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 23 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF THE HEADWATERS OF THE RIVER TAWE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING. B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY TO NEW OR EXISTING BUSINESSES, WHETHER IN THE PRIVATE OR VOLUNTARY SECTORS. C) THE ESTABLISHMENT OR PROVISION OF PREMISES TO ASSIST NEW OR EXISTING BUSINESSES, WHETHER IN THE PRIVATE OR VOLUNTARY SECTORS. D) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. F) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. G) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OR THE ENVIRONMENT. H) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE POWYS, DYFED, CARMARTHENSHIRE, NEATH, PORT TALBOT, SWANSEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window