TOLLERTON SPORTS & RECREATION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold in trust and manage Tollerton sports & recreation field for the benefit of the residents of Tollerton and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN RUPERT BROOK | Chair | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CLIVE THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN PAUL JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.47k | £10.09k | £1.07k | £3.80k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.43k | £3.39k | £4.02k | £3.48k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.86k | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO HOLD IN TRUST A PLAYING AND RECREATION FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TOLLERTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE AND OF THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS FOR ALL FORMS OF OUTDOOR SPORT INCLUDING USE FOR CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TOLLERTON AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 INGS VIEW
TOLLERTON
YORK
YO61 1PR
- Phone:
- 01347833216
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window