SNEH ARTH YOG TRUST (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organised Camp from 3-8 December 2006 by Shri Ramdev Swami, attended daily by over 1500 people to learn Yoga to alleviate common diseases, improve health and well-being. We provide financial support to children, the elderly, schools and hospitals in Bhuj District, India - during COVID donated masks to Meghpur Villagers, 100 oxygen cylinders to Bhuj Hospital, fitted Sanitisation units in school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 12 September 2006: Standard registration
- SAY (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NANJI HALAI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ramesh Halai | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MEGHBAI HALAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIRMALA VARSANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.40k | £21.10k | £7.75k | £16.55k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.93k | £19.86k | £10.31k | £11.30k | £12.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND INDIA. (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK AND INDIA.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 WEMBOROUGH ROAD
STANMORE
HA7 2EE
- Phone:
- 07951862184
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window