HORNIMAN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the school and promoting co-operation between parents/carers and the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Lewisham
Governance
- 23 June 2006: Standard registration
- HORNIMAN PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Fredrick Bond | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marie Cloherty | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wood | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leo Wood | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mia Agoumi | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Moreton | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Szarmach | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.94k | £24.21k | £23.16k | £17.75k | £23.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.81k | £19.68k | £20.42k | £17.36k | £27.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7 JUNE 2005 as amended on 17 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS; 3. TO SUPPORT THE AIMS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FOREST HILL, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horniman School
Horniman Drive
LONDON
SE23 3BP
- Phone:
- 02086993190
- Email:
- hornimanprimarypta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window