Financial history FRIENDS OF ROUGHTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1114750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/09/2020 13/09/2021 13/09/2022 13/09/2023 13/09/2024
Total gross income £3.10k £518 £5.95k £5.90k £4.03k
Total expenditure £3.22k £950 £4.47k £7.38k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A