Financial history ROTARY DISTRICT 1120 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1114736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £44.90k £113.01k £27.64k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £39.50k £115.37k £22.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A