NATIONAL JUSTICE AND PEACE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NJPN organises and runs, for the benefit of members and non-members: An annual national conference. Quarterly network meetings, two of which are held in London, with expert speakers on local issues. A comprehensive website on justice and penal issues and organisations. Membership currently comprises: RC Dioceses, groups, eg Religious Orders, development organisations, etc, individual members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
- NJPN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Edward Southgate | Chair | 21 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Annette Claire Brindle | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ingham | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE THERESE PEACEY | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN FRANCIS BURR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.91k | £65.65k | £67.86k | £58.84k | £59.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.22k | £28.10k | £69.06k | £57.94k | £60.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CHRISTIAN VALUES OF JUSTICE AND PEACE BY CHARITABLE MEANS, IN PARTICULAR BY: A PROMOTING THE WORK OF JUSTICE AND PEACE; B WORKING IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOPS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND THEIR AGENCIES TO ADVANCE THE PRACTICE OF SOCIAL TEACHING OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT OF DIOCESAN JUSTICE AND PEACE GROUPS AND OTHER BODIES THAT SHARE THEIR CONCERN TO BRING THE GOOD NEWS OF CHRIST'S LOVE AND PEACE TO PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED AND TO WORK TO EMPOWER THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES; C PROMOTING APPROPRIATE PRAYER, STUDY, CELEBRATION AND SPIRITUALITY WITHIN RELIGIOUS PRACTICE TO INSPIRE SOLIDARITY WITH THOSE IN NEED; D RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT SOCIAL JUSTICE, NON VIOLENCE, ECOLOGICAL AND HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES AS CENTRAL TO THE LIFE OF THE CHURCH AND BENEFICIAL TO THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY; E ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING WORK, ACTION AND CAMPAIGNING FOR SOCIAL CHANGE ON ISSUES OF JUSTICE AND PEACE BY RAISING AWARENESS THROUGH PROVISION OF TRAINING, WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES, PUBLICATIONS AND THE LIKE; F BUILDING NETWORKS WITH ALL THOSE WHO SHARE OUR VISION AND AIMS, PROMOTING COMMUNICATION TO SEEK COLLABORATION OVER ACTION, RESOURCES, METHODS AND GOOD PRACTICE. IN PURSUING THE OBJECTS, THE NETWORK SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND SHALL, IN ITS OWN ACTIVITIES, IMPLEMENT AN EFFECTIVE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1BX
- Phone:
- 02079014864
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window