MTB 102 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and operation of MTB 102, which is listed on the National Historic Ships Register.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GEORGE BASEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
PHILIP ROSS NORTON | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL SIDNEY HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.74k | £61.23k | £67.75k | £67.72k | £66.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.26k | £38.49k | £56.24k | £54.35k | £54.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION A MOTOR TORPEDO BOAT MTB 102 AND TO ACQUIRE, MAINTAIN, RESTORE, CONSERVE AND IMPROVE OTHER HISTORIC NAVAL VESSELS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 SEA LAKE ROAD
OULTON BROAD
LOWESTOFT
NR32 3LQ
- Phone:
- 07921389158
- Email:
- mtb102trust@btconnect.com.
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window