Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AYOMIDE PARISH

Charity Number: 1115765
Charity reporting is up to date (142 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £36.95k £35.12k £47.14k £77.62k £31.75k
Total expenditure £45.02k £37.72k £39.18k £54.97k £34.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A