SOMALI ADVICE AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current services are: Mentoring Young People at Risk of Crime Advice, Information & Guidance (including welfare, benefits, immigration et al.) Youth Club Support for Somali Youth Offenders at Feltham YOI Somali Community Resilience Project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 July 2006: Standard registration
- ASDC (Working name)
- ACCESS FOR SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdulkadir Abdi Warsame | Chair | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruqiyo Dirie | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fathia Abdi | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Jabar Amin | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDIHAKIM KHALIF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.25k | £69.08k | £41.92k | £20.60k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.02k | £84.25k | £67.74k | £46.63k | £12.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £82.25k | £69.08k | £41.92k | £20.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM THE SOMALI COMMUNITY, ESPECIALLY THOSE AT RISK OF CRIMINAL BEHAVIOUR AND ACTIVITIES. (B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES, AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Gateway Court
Convent Way
SOUTHALL
Middlesex
UB2 5PT
- Phone:
- 07500836708
- Email:
- info@sadc-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window