Financial history THE COLLINS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1114848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £254 £254 £1.27k £95.00k £245.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £95.13k £50.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A