Accounts and annual returns THE OSGOLDCROSS FORUM

Charity number: 1116330
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 February 2015 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 10 February 2015 10 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 09 June 2014 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 22 July 2013 On Time