WALTHAM FOREST THUSO IN SOUTH AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money to support a feeding scheme for destitute pupils at Thuto Lesedi Secondary School. We also send books to assist development of school libraries, and send Solar study lamps. Thuto Lesedi Secondary school is historically a "Black only" school in Vosloorus, Gauteng Province in South Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- South Africa
Governance
- 04 July 2006: Standard registration
- THUSO (Working name)
- WFTISA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MMAPULA TLADI - SMALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr HELEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY WEITZEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE DANIEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TANIA COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.51k | £6.06k | £3.39k | £1.34k | £5.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £5.10k | £5.09k | £6.75k | £3.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF SCHOOL STUDENTS IN SOUTH AFRICA, COMMENCING WITH STUDENTS AT THUTO LESEDI HIGH SCHOOL, VOSLOORUS, GAUTENG PROVINCE AND LOBETHAL MISSION PRIMARY SCHOOL, LIMPOPO PROVINCE. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR EX-SPONSORED STUDENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING. CONTRIBUTING TO THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF AIDS ORPHANS AND THEIR CARERS, VIA SUCH PROJECTS AS, AND COMMENCING WITH, AZWIKUNDI WOMEN'S COOPERATIVE, ATTRIDGEVILLE, GAUTENG PROVINCE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hornbeam Centre
458 Hoe Street
LONDON
E17 9AH
- Phone:
- 07508038472
- Email:
- info@thuso.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window