Accounts and annual returns TAKEOVER RADIO CHILDREN'S MEDIA TRUST

Charity Number: 1115483
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 November 2021 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 July 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required