THE HOLY ANGELS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Though the mission of the church to provide and maintain a multi-purpose day centre for the relief of elderly housebound and handicapped persons living within the boundary of the Borough of Walsall and to make available facilities for the social welfare, recreation and leisure time occupation of such persons and to provide meals and refreshments for such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 19 July 2006: Standard registration
- 24 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HACT (Working name)
- HOLY ANGELS TRUST (Working name)
- ST GABRIELS DAY CARE CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.80k | £186.88k | £120.81k | £72.43k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.94k | £145.94k | £152.48k | £133.93k | £896 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") THROUGH THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MULTI-PURPOSE DAY CENTRE FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY HOUSEBOUND AND HANDICAPPED PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE BOUNDARY OF THE BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND MORE SPECIFICALLY WITHIN THE PARISHES OF WALSALL ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS CALDMORE WITH ST MARY AND ALL SAINTS PALFREY WALSALL ST GABRIEL AND WALSALL ST ANDREW BIRCHILLS AND THE THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL WELFARE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE AND TO PROVIDE MEALS AND REFRESHMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS IN NEED WHETHER FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE AND FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS BEING FOR THE WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS AS NOW OR IN FUTURE MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window