MUSLIM SHIA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGOUS GATHERINGS (MUHARAM)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 June 2006: Standard registration
- MSWF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED TANSIR ASGHAR BUKHARI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOAZZAM ABBAS SHAMSI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAZA ALI SAJANLAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYED KAUSER ABBAS JAFRI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SYED IQBAL HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.90k | £620 | £600 | £600 | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 573 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 573 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SHIA ITHNAASHERIA AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG MANKIND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 FAIRFAX ROAD
LEICESTER
LE4 9EL
- Phone:
- 07973695644
- Email:
- MSWF7861@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window