Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY INITIATIVE PROGRAMME UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1115539
Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 July 2022 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 July 2022 704 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required