THOMAS MORGAN LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT CHILDRENS HOSPICE WITH TOYS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 May 2006: Standard registration
- 21 January 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THOMAS MORGAN CHILDCARE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | 03 December 2014 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2012 | 13 November 2013 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER IN ITS VARIOUS FORMS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AND FURTHER AFIELD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND VOLUNTARY PRACTICAL SUPPORT
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window