Trustees THE HARVINGTON YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1115838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pete Ashplant Chair 01 September 2018
EVESHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Received: On time
Paul Wingert Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Jayne Nicol Trustee 28 March 2023
OFFENHAM OLD SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
John Liggitt Trustee 24 June 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, EVESHAM
Received: On time
SANDRA KAY DAVIES Trustee 07 January 2019
HARVINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
REVEREND CANON RICHARD JAMES GORDON THORNILEY Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, HARVINGTON
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Andrew Cracknell Trustee
None on record