PATANJALI YOG PEETH (UK) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and awareness of Healthy Living and Life Style, Yoga Teaching for a quality, sound , healthy life and welbeing, Sickness prevention through Healthy Body and mind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 July 2006: Standard registration
- DIVYA YOG (Working name)
- PATANJALI YOG (Working name)
- PYP UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SWAMI RAMDEV MAHARAJ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUNITA PODDAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ACHARYA BAL KRISHNA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.21k | £47.90k | £82.96k | £86.88k | £61.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.92k | £48.19k | £99.65k | £89.55k | £40.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS BY THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE ANCIENT INDIAN SCIENCES OF AYURVEDA AND PRANAYAMA YOGA AND BY SUPPORTING THE AIMS AND WORK OF THE PATANJALI YOG PEETH (CHARITY REGISTERED IN INDIA) IN ORDER TO FURTHER THE FOREGOING AND SUCH OTHER OBJECTIVES THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. THROUGHOUT THIS TRUST DEED "CHARITABLE" MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Patanjali Yog Peeth (UK) Trust
40 LAMBHILL STREET
KINNING PARK
GLASGOW
G41 1AU
- Phone:
- 01414277510
- Email:
- admin@pypt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window