SURVEILLANCE STUDIES NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and promote the free exchange of academic information about surveillance across academic disciplines and cultures Promote learning and the sharing of knowledge about surveillance between scholars, students, organisations and the public world-wide; Own and publish the journal Surveillance and Society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ecuador
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Liechtenstein
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Mexico
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Venezuela
Governance
- 04 January 2007: Standard registration
- SSN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Julia Sze Hang Chan | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dean Wilson | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.23k | £1.30k | £1.50k | £21.23k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £4.05k | £4.92k | £8.53k | £11.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF SURVEILLANCE AS A FACET OF CONTEMPORARY SOCIAL AND TECHNOLOGICAL CHANGE AND ITS CONSEQUENCES FOR INDIVIDUALS, GROUPS, ORGANISATIONS, NATIONS AND REGIONS BY: 1. SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE FREE EXCHANGE OF ACADEMIC INFORMATION ABOUT SURVEILLANCE ACROSS ACADEMIC DISCIPLINES AND CULTURES; 2. PROMOTING LEARNING AND THE SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT SURVEILLANCE BETWEEN SCHOLARS, STUDENTS, ORGANISATIONS AND THE PUBLIC WORLD-WIDE; 3. OWNING AND PUBLISHING A JOURNAL KNOWN AS SURVEILLANCE AND SOCIETY AND OTHER ONLINE RESOURCES DEVOTED TO THE PUBLICATION OF COMMUNICATIONS WHICH ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING THE STUDY OF SURVEILLANCE AND SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 WESTERN ROAD
LEWES
EAST SUSSEX
BN7 1RS
- Phone:
- 01273 240331
- Email:
- dean.wilson@sussex.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window