SAVE THE ORPHANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training, Relief of poverty in Uganda, Medical/health/sickness in Uganda, Religious activities in England and Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Uganda
Governance
- 26 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MARTIN | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PRISCILLA KIBUUKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MPUMWIRE BAMUTURAKI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.15k | £8.95k | £9.11k | £6.00k | £8.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £8.83k | £9.06k | £5.80k | £7.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF ORPHANAGES, SHELTER, FOOD AND MEDICAL AID TO ORPHANS, FAMILIES AND THOSE IN NEED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 CORNISH HOUSE
GREEN DRAGON LANE
BRENTFORD
TW8 0DF
- Phone:
- 02085820980
- Email:
- savetheorphansug@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window