THE GLOBAL EXCHANGE FOR SOCIAL INVESTMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Social Business Development (GEXSI Lab) Mentoring of social ventures that aim to tackle social or environmental challenges related to poverty, e.g. biodiversity businesses. 2. Impact Investing (Research) Analysing ways to improve access to "social risk capital" for above mentioned social businesses 3. Base-of-the Pyramid Fund Piloting programme related investments to alleviate poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Madagascar
Governance
- 08 February 2007: Standard registration
- 27 May 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.59k | £11.84k | £4.65k | £4.19k | £180 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.84k | £13.90k | £2.65k | £10.66k | £613 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 04 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 04 December 2014 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 27 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 26 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3.2) TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF: 3.2.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 3.2.2) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES AND THE ACHIEVEMENT OF ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION BY SUSTAINABLE MEANS; 3.2.3 THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHCARE IN COMMUNITIES; AND 3.2.4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3.3) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 3.3.1) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; 3.3.2) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS TO ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 3.4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CONDUCTING AND COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO MEANS OF ACHIEVING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; AND 3.5) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER FIT WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window