Financial history SYAC LTD

Charity number: 1125770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £126.94k £100.18k £150.34k £179.58k £189.51k
Total expenditure £114.07k £101.74k £132.44k £150.34k £162.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A